Pioneer Natural Resources USA v. Zurich American Insurance Co. et al

Plaintiff: Pioneer Natural Resources USA
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co., Mutual Marine Office Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Case Number: 3:2008cv00227
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 81 Motion to Remand and this matter shall be remanded to the 19th JDC for EBRP. Signed by Judge John V. Parker on 10/7/2009. (JDL, )
February 10, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 56 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 5 Motion to Remand filed by Pioneer Natural Resources, USA, Inc., Pioneer Natural Resources Company is hereby Denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/10/09. (BP, )
January 7, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 5 MOTION to Remand and for Costs filed by Pioneer Natural Resources, USA, Inc., Pioneer Natural Resources Company. The Magistrate Judge finds that the litigation relates to an arbitration agreement that f alls under the Convention on the Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Awards, 9 U.S.C. §§ 201-208, and therefore the matter was properly removed pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 205. For the reasons stated above, the Magistrate Judge recommends that the plaintiffs' motion to remand and for costs (rec. doc. 5), should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/6/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Natural Resources USA v. Zurich American Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Natural Resources USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Marine Office Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Represented By: Anne Derbes Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?