Gillum v. ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Thomas Gillum
Defendant: ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00314
Filed: May 22, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC is granted and this matter is dismissed with prejudice and at pltfs cost. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/29/2010. (JDL, )
November 19, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed filed by ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC...It is recommended that the Motion for Summary Judgment should be granted and that this suit be dismissed with prejudice and at plaintiff's cost... Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/19/09. (LSM, )
July 16, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant, ICF Emergency Management Services,L.L.C., shall produce, within twenty (20) days of this Order: (1) all claims/complaints of age discrimi nation and disparate treatment, (2) asserted by employees of the Small Rental Program and the Homeowner Program of the Louisiana Road Home Program, (3) for the past five (5) years. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims/complaints produced by ICF shal l be subject to the protective order previously entered by the parties to this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for an award of the reasonable expenses, including attorneys fees, incurred in bringing the present motion shall be DENIED and that each party shall bear its own costs and expenses relative to this motion.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/16/09. (LSM, )
May 21, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: The defts 21 Motion to Compel Discovery and Initial Disclosures is GRANTED IN PART, in that pltf, Thomas Gillum, shall clarify his responses to Interrogatory #3 within 20 days of this Order, and DENIED IN PART, as to defts request for an award of attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/21/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillum v. ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gillum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICF Emergency Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Englander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?