Labat v. Louisiana Community and Technical College System, et al

Plaintiff: Keith J Labat
Defendant: Louisiana Community and Technical College System, Calvin Jody Peterson and Dianne Peterson
Case Number: 3:2008cv00377
Filed: June 24, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding 69 MOTION for Contempt filed by Keith J. Labat : Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(e)(6), the magistrate judge certifies to the district judge, for the purpose of determining whether to order the defendants to show cause why they sh ould not be held in contempt of court, that defendants Calvin Jody Peterson and Diane Peterson failed to respond to discovery in accordance with the court's order issued February 26, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/1/10. (BP)
March 23, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 66 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 61 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Louisiana Community and Technical College System is granted and the claims against Louisiana Community and Technical College System are dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/23/10. (BP, )
March 1, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Louisiana Community and Technical College System. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted and the claims against Louisiana Community and Technical College System be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/26/10. (BP, )
May 1, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 30 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Louisiana Community and Technical College System is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/1/09. (BP, )
April 7, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Louisiana Community and Technical College System. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendant's motion for summary judgment be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/6/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labat v. Louisiana Community and Technical College System, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J Labat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Community and Technical College System
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Jody Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?