Pooler v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Robert Pooler
Defendant: Burl Cain, Kenneth Temple, Kendra Harris, Mack Shaw and Donald Barr
Case Number: 3:2008cv00442
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 52 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pltfs complaint will be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to pay the court's filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/8/2010. (JDL, )
February 5, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiff/appellant is granted 20 days from the date of this Order to pay $455.00, the full amount of the Court's appellate filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/4/2010. (JDL, )
April 28, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 28 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and the defendants motions to dismiss, rec.doc.nos. 15 and 21, are granted in p art, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against the defendants in their official capacities and dismissing the plaintiffs claims regarding the alleged incident of August 14, 2007, and regarding the prison policy relative to inmates being disallowed fro m entering prison buildings without permission. Further, the plaintiffs remaining claim, that he is allegedly not provided with access to a restroom when needed during certain hours of the day, is hereby referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/28/2009. (NLT, )
February 19, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tyson Bonnette, James LeBlanc, 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mack Shaw, Burl Cain, Kendra Harris, Donald Barr, Kenneth Temple...It is recommended that the the Court decline to exe rcise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and that the defendants motions to dismiss, rec.doc.nos. 15 and 21, be granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against the defendants in their official capacities and dism issing the plaintiffs claims regarding the alleged incident of August 14, 2007, and regarding the prison policy relative to inmates being disallowed from entering prison buildings without permission. It is further recommended that the plaintiffs rema ining claim, that he is allegedly not provided with access to a restroom when needed during certain hours of the day, be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.... Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/19/2009. (NLT, ) Modified on 2/19/2009 (NLT, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pooler v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pooler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?