BrooksGreenblatt, L.L.C. v. C. Martin Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: BrooksGreenblatt, L.L.C.
Defendant: C. Martin Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00454
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING...The 129 motion by third party defendant, John Lee Harden, Jr., for summary judgment is DENIED, and the 126 motion by third partyplaintiff, C. Martin Company, Inc., for reconsideration of the Ruling of March 16, 2012 is GRANTED only insof ar as C. Martin seeks summary judgment against third party defendants, Superior Logistics, L.L.C., and John Lee Harden, Jr., and default judgment against third party defendants, Richard G. Poore and Carlos Johnson, for damages in the amount of $ 290,900.00 and DENIED insofar as C. Martin seeks an award of $2,527.80 for costs incurred by Fidelity in this matter. The foregoing denial, however, is without prejudice to the right of C. Martin, as the prevailing party, to seek reasonable costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). Judgment shall issue accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/4/2012. (LSM)
March 16, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Default Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Summary Judgment as stated herein. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/16/12. (DCB) Modified on 3/16/2012 to correct docket entry title (DCB).
July 21, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 86 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff Brooksgreenblatt, L.L.C.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. Plaintiff's Partial Summary Judgment on Affirmative Defenses is granted in part and denied in part. With the exception of it's affirmative defense of equitable estoppel, the defendant's affirmative defenses are dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/20/10. (BP, )
May 12, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Brooksgreenblat, LLC's 50 Motion to Sever Third-Party Claims and Alternative Motion for Separate Trials is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/12/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BrooksGreenblatt, L.L.C. v. C. Martin Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BrooksGreenblatt, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Eric Lockridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Martin Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?