Love v. Bendily

Plaintiff: Lewis E. Love
Defendant: Jody Bendily, Dennis Grimes, Steve Rader, James LeBlanc and Richard Stalder
Case Number: 3:2008cv00506
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned proceeding shall be dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25 (a). Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/1/2015. (BCL)
February 21, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Defense 61 Motion to Dismiss 1 Original Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's claims for declaratory and injunction relief are DISMISSED AS MOOT. In all other respects, the Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/20/2013. (LLH)
July 23, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: For the reasons set forth in the court's ruling on the motion for temporary restraining order, the pltfs 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/23/2009. (JDL, )
March 27, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pltfs 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/27/2009. (JDL, )
February 27, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lewis E. Love..recommends that the motion be denied.. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 02/27/09. (PAH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Bendily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis E. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Bendily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?