United National Insurance Co v. City of St. Gabriel

Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Defendant: City of St. Gabriel
Case Number: 3:2008cv00575
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: East Baton Rouge
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 33 Joint MOTION to Intervene filed by Antoinette Rider. Pla's prayer for atty's fees and costs being the only claim remaining before the court, that issue is hereby referred to USMJ Stephen Riedlinger. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/13/09. (BP, )
June 3, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2009. (JDL, )
May 19, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT : granting 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United National Insurance Company. Within 10 days of this date, the parties are to submit a joint proposed judgment that dismisses this action in accordance with the foregoing discussion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/19/09. (BP, )
March 25, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by City of St. Gabriel, and deft is ORDERED to oppose or otherwise plead in response to the pending motion for summary judgment filed by pltf, United National Insurance Co 14 within 10 days of this date. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/25/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United National Insurance Co v. City of St. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: Mickey S. deLaup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?