Gines v. D. R. Horton, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mike Gines
Defendant: D. R. Horton, Inc. and Reliant Heating and Air Conditioning of Louisiana, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00598
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/25/12. (DCB)
October 21, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Mike Gines. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/20/2011. (LSM)
July 28, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. Party(s) D. R. Horton, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/28/2011. (NLT)
June 30, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 8 Motion to Remand filed by Mike Gines is DENIED. 21 Motion to Strike or limit use of affidavit of Mike Gines filed by D. R. Horton, Inc., Reliant Heating and Air Conditioning of Louisiana, L.L.C. is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/30/09. (BP, )
June 2, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Mike Gines, 21 MOTION to Strike or Limit Use of Affidavit of Robert Michael "Mike" Gines filed by D. R. Horton, Inc., Reliant Heating and Air Conditioning of Louisi ana, L.L.C. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the motion to remand should be DENIED; IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the motion to strike or limit use of affidavit of Mike Gines should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/2/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gines v. D. R. Horton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. R. Horton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Heating and Air Conditioning of Louisiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Robert Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?