Bellard v. Gautreaux

Plaintiff: Shane Bellard
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Case Number: 3:2008cv00627
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sid J. Gautreaux, III. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 03/22/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
December 2, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 52 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment filed by Shane Bellard. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 12/01/2010. (Williams, Lysandra)
September 3, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 09/03/2010. (Williams, Lysandra)
November 3, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 11 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by deft Sid J. Gautreaux, III is denied, and the 15 Pltfs Motion to Compel Discovery in Compliance with a Rule 30(b)(6) Request for Production of Documents is also denied. The parties shall bear their respective costs in connection with these motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/3/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellard v. Gautreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Bellard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?