Stewart v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Ronald G. Stewart
Respondent: Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00641
Filed: October 8, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Reopen Case Under Rule 60(b). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/23/2017. (LLH)
September 29, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the 70 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Petitioner's application for habeas corpus is DENIED, and in the event that the petitioner seeks to pursue an appeal in this case, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/29/2016. (LLH)
October 18, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, 59 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and to Expand Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/17/2013. (SMG)
February 8, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 44 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and the 35 "Supplement to Original Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus" filed by Ronald Gene Stewart, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/8/2012. (LSM)
March 24, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ronald G. Stewart, shall be dismissed with prejudice as untimely filed. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald G. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?