Clennon v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Clennon
Defendant: Joshua Cain, Walter Newman, Trish Foster, N. Burl Cain, James LeBlanc, Roderick Veal and Claire Griffin
Case Number: 3:2008cv00677
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 71 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby denied. Defendants' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby granted in part, dismissi ng the plaintiff's claims against James LeBlanc, Warden N. Burl Cain, Trish Foster and Claire Griffin and in all other respects, the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby denied and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the plaintiff's Eight Amendment failure to protect claim against Joshua Cain, Walter Newman, and Roderick Veal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/28/2010. (LSM, )
January 5, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defts, 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by pltf, and 70 Supplement to pltfs motion for summary judgment...It is recommended that the pltfs motion for summary judgm ent be denied, that the defts motion for summary judgment be granted in part, dismissing the pltfs claims against James LeBlanc, Warden N. Burl Cain, Trish Foster and Claire Griffin and in all other respects the defts motion for summary judgment be d enied and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the pltfs Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim against Joshua Cain, Walter Newman and Rodrick Veal... Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/5/2010. (JDL, )
October 6, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 56 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/2009. (JDL, )
June 10, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 26 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Claire Griffin, Joshua Cain, Trish Foster, James LeBlanc, N. Burl Cain, Walter Newman is hereby denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/10/09. (BP, )
May 15, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Claire Griffin, Joshua Cain, Trish Foster, James LeBlanc, N. Burl Cain, Walter Newman. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants motion to dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 05/15/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clennon v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Veal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?