Germalic v. Secretary of State et al

Plaintiff: James Germalic
Defendant: Secretary of State, State of Louisiana and Jay Dardenne
Case Number: 3:2008cv00689
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 21 Motion to reconsider, construed as a motion for relief from a judgment or order is hereby DENIED.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/3/2011. (CMM)
July 28, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, accepting the facts alleged as true and construing them in the light most favorable to the pltf, the Court concludes that pltf has failed to state a claim upon with relief may be granted. The 17 motion for dismissal, filed by dft, Tom Schedler, Louisiana Secretary of State, is hereby Granted, and this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/26/2011. (CMM)
January 29, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 2 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 1 Complaint filed by James Germalic. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/29/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germalic v. Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Germalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?