Smith v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Bobby Smith
Respondent: Burl N Cain and James D. Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2008cv00698
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/11/2010. (CMM, )
June 23, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Having so concluded, and in light of the court's previous dismissal of all other grounds set forth in petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (doc. 21), the court shall issue judgment in favor of the State and against petitioner, Bobby Jones, dismissing, with prejudice, petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/23/2010. (JDL, )
August 12, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 18 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief shall be DENIED as to Grounds 1 through 6. Further, counsel shall be appointed by the Magistrate Judge to represent petitioner, pursuant to Rule 8(c), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and as provided by the CJA, 28 USC 3006(a)(2)(B). Newly appointed counsel shall move for an evidentiary hearing to be held on Ground 7, as described. Signed by Judge John V. Parker on 8/11/2009. (JDL, )
June 19, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bobby Smith. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief be denied as to Grounds 1 through 6. It is further recommended that counsel be appointed to represent the petitioner, pursuant to Rule 8(c), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and as provided by the Criminal Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 3006A(a)(2)(B), and that an evidentiary hearing be held on Ground 7, specifically, whether the State exercised its peremptory challenges in a racially discriminatory manner, thereby violating the petitioner's Fourteenth Amendment rights. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/19/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl N Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?