Davis v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana, Sid J Gautreaux, James W. Cooper, Matthew G Holley, Jacqueline Bailey, Devin Jarreau and John Michael Knapp
Case Number: 3:2008cv00708
Filed: November 13, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER Granted in part and Denied in part 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sid J Gautreaux, John Michael Knapp, Jacqueline Bailey, Matthew G Holley, East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Devin Jarreau, James W. Cooper. GRANTED as to Plaintiff s §1983 claims against Defendants in their official capacities, and Plaintiffs state law claim for intentional infliction of emotional distress. It is DENIED as to Plaintiff s §1983 excessive for ce claim against the deputies in their individual capacities, §1983 claim for punitive damages, and state law claims of negligence and assault and battery. ORDERED that Plaintiffs intentional infliction of emotional d istress claim and §1983 claims against Sgt. Cooper, Dep. Holley, Dep. Bailey, Dep. Jarreau and Dep. Knapp in their official capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that Sheriff Gautreaux is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/02/2016. (ELW)
June 17, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 36 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. As provided by Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(ii), plaintiff Joseph Davis is prohibited from supporting his claimswith the records or testimony, in any form, from any health care provider he has seen duri ng the past 10 years, i.e. since 2005, through May 29, 2015, and the testimony of Gwendolyn Davis, again in any form. Pursuant to Rule 37(d)(3), the plaintiff shall pay to the defendants, within 14 days, their reasonable expenses in the amount of $500.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 06/17/2015. (BCL)
December 1, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 7 defendants Motion to Dismiss. GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against the East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office...MOOT insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiff 's claims against Sheriff Gautreaux...Plaintiff be granted leave to amend his complaint in accordance with Section II of this Ruling. Plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed within 14 days from the date of this Ruling. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Plaintiff's 42U.S.C.§1983 claims. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 11/30/10. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J Gautreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Michael Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?