Clay v. Ouber et al

Plaintiff: Derick Clay
Defendant: Chad Ouber, John Hughes, Jimmy Smith and John Does 1-6
Case Number: 3:2008cv00748
Filed: November 13, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment.. the Court finds in the alternative that Jimmy Smith is entitled to the defense of qualified immunity, and his motion for summary judgment should be granted. As to the other named defendants in this matter, the Court finds that there are genuine issues of material fact in dispute such that summary judgment is not proper. Therefore, the motion for summary judgment by the remaining defendants shall be denied, and the jury trial scheduled to begin on June 27, 2011, shall proceed.Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 06/27/11. (PAH) Modified on 6/27/2011 to edi text(PAH).
March 2, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Proposed Pretrial Orders due by 4/1/2010. Warden of LSP shall produce pltf Derick Clay #441751 in the video conferencing facilities at LSP. (Cert copy sent to USM for Warden at LSP) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/2/2010. (JDL, )
March 18, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 19 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss shall be denied. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/18/2009. (NLT, )
February 20, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jimmy Smith, John Hughes, Chad Ouber. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants' motion to dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/20/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. Ouber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Ouber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?