Ross v. Burger King Corporation

Plaintiff: Kyra J Ross
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00766
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Kyra J Ross and this matter shall be remanded to the 19th JDC. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/13/09. (BP, )
July 22, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: 13 Motion to Compel filed by deft, Burger King Corporation is GRANTED, and pltf, Kyra J. Ross, is to provide complete responses within 15 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/22/2009. (JDL, )
May 11, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Kyra J Ross is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/11/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra J Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Represented By: Christian B. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?