Stewart v. Seng et al

Plaintiff: Keith Stewart
Defendant: Unknown Seng, Charles Gaylor and Unknown EMTs
Case Number: 3:2009cv00017
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 77 Report and Recommendations of the USMJ. Plaintiff's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED and defendant's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/10/2010. (NLT)
January 21, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unknown Seng and 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith Stewart...It is recommended that the pltfs motion for summary judgment be denied, the defts motion for summary judgment be granted, and this action be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/21/2010. (JDL, )
November 10, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 49 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The parties motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Further, the claims against Sgt. Charles Gaylor and the unidentified emergency medical technicians are DISMISSED for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/10/2009. (JDL, )
November 4, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 54 request for a settlement conference filed by Keith Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/4/2009. (JDL, )
October 14, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Pltfs 55 Request to Serve a Subpoena is denied, without prejudice to pltf renewing his request after the case is set for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/14/2009. (JDL, )
September 30, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 52 Motion to Receive Copies of Documents Presented to the Court as Exhibits is denied, without prejudice to the pltf obtaining copies of his exhibits from the clerk of court upon paying the clerk's usual charge for copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/30/2009. (JDL, )
September 11, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 18 , 22 & 35 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment...It is recommended that the parties motions for summary judgment be denied. It is further recommended that the claims against Sgt. Charles Gaylord and the unidentified emergency medical technicians be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(m)... Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/11/2009. (JDL, )
September 9, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Pltfs 45 Motion for Rule 40 Assignment of Case for Trial is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/9/2009. (JDL, )
August 20, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 33 Pltfs Motion to Compel Discovery. Defts shall serve and file responses to the pltfs discovery, without objections, within 10 days from the date of this ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/20/2009. (JDL, )
April 29, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Unknown Seng is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/29/09. (BP, )
April 9, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unknown Seng. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the Motion to Dismiss by defendant Dr. Preety Singh be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/9/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Seng et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Gaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown EMTs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?