Daniel et al v. Caesar et al

Plaintiff: Oran Daniel and Marilyn Daniel
Defendant: Elizabeth Caesar, Charles Malham, Christian Brothers University, Congregation of Christian Brothers, Crawford & Company, Progressive Security Insurance Company and Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00041
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 17 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case shall be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 4/22/2009. (NLT, )
March 27, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Christian Brothers University, Charles Malham, Elizabeth Caesar, Crawford & Company, Congregation of Christian Brothers...It is recommended that this case be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction... Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/27/2009. (NLT, )
March 25, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 10 Motion to Quash deposition of plaintiff Oran Daniel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/24/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel et al v. Caesar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oran Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Caesar
Represented By: Patrick M. Wartelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Malham
Represented By: Patrick M. Wartelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Brothers University
Represented By: Patrick M. Wartelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congregation of Christian Brothers
Represented By: Patrick M. Wartelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Wartelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?