Sears et al v. Livingston Management Inc.

Plaintiff: Aldona Manuel Taisha Sears, United States of America and Neotha Gibson
Defendant: Livingston Management Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00045
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 67 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint in Part. Plaintiffs' claims arising under the LIHTC program are here by dismissed with prejudice, reserving Plaintiff's claims arising out of the rural development program. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/29/2013. (CGP)
July 11, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated False Claims Act Complaint filed by Aldona Manuel, Taisha Sears, Neotha Gibson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 07/11/2013. (SMG)
May 10, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 5/9/2012. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears et al v. Livingston Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livingston Management Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Borghardt
Represented By: Craig Frank Holthaus
Represented By: Lindsey M. Nelson
Represented By: Richard Michael Price
Represented By: D. Grayson Yeargin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldona Manuel Taisha Sears
Represented By: Angela Lumzy Jones
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Patrick Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neotha Gibson
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Angela Lumzy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?