Carson v. Allstate Indemnity Company

Case Number: 3:2009cv00060
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Indemnity Insurance.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/28/2012. (LSM) Modified on 2/28/2012 to edit text (LSM).
November 30, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration of 36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Albert G. Carson, IV. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/29/2011. (LSM)
April 28, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 6 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Remand 3 filed by pltf is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/28/2009. (JDL, )
March 2, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Albert G. Carson, IV...It is recommended that the motion should be DENIED... Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/2/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?