Lee v. West et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Lee
Defendant: Johnny West, Daniel Davis, Scott Adams and Michael McGee
Case Number: 3:2009cv00065
Filed: February 6, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Feliciana
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 71 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the defts 63 second motion for summary judgment will be granted and this action will be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/24/2010. (JDL, )
October 26, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Defts 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 10/26/2009. (JDL, )
September 16, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Davis, Scott Adams, Johnny West, Michael McGee...It is recommended that the defts motion for summary judgment be denied... Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/16/2009. (JDL, )
June 30, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denied 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Benjamin Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 06/29/09. (LSM, )
June 4, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Daniel Davis, Scott Adams, Johnny West, Michael McGee and 9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniel Davis, Scott Adams, Johnny West, Michael McGee are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/3/09. (BP, )
April 8, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Defts 11 MOTION to Dismiss and 9 MOTION to Dismiss...It is recommended that the defts motions to dismiss be denied... Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/8/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?