United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency v. Louisiana Generating, LLC

Plaintiff: United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency
Defendant: Louisiana Generating, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00100
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:7413(b) Clean Air Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 387 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 345 MOTION To Amend Summary Judgment Ruling To Certify It For Interlocutory Appeal And Motion For Stay Pending Appeal filed by Louisiana Generating, LLC. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/01/2012. (SMG)
September 19, 2012 332 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT..the motions on the standard to be employed by the Court in assessing RMRR 133 and 140 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part....Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on the applicability of the RMRR exception 132 is GRANTED. Further, when the parties refer to attachments, exhibits, or evidence of any sort in future filings, they are to point to a specific docket entry where the document can be found. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/18/2012. (KDC) Modified on 9/19/2012 to edit document title (KDC).
May 14, 2012 298 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 193 , 195 , and 196 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/14/2012. (CMM) Modified on 5/14/2012 to edit text. (CMM)
December 1, 2011 260 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs Motion (doc. 136) on successor liability and DENIES Defendants Motions on PSD liability and Title V liability (docs. 138 and 139). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/30/2011. (JDL)
March 5, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Stipulation Regarding Preservation, Review and Production of Certain Electronically Stored Information and Privileged Material. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/5/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency v. Louisiana Generating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Generating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?