Williams v. State of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Felmon Felton Williams
Defendant: State of Louisiana and Buddy Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2009cv00103
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 27 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Felmon Felton Williams is denied and 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Buddy Caldwell, State of Louisiana is granted. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/27/10. (BP)
January 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Buddy Caldwell, State of Louisiana is denied, and the plaintiff's claim is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/7/2010. (LSM, )
December 10, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Buddy Caldwell, State of Louisiana...It is recommended that the defendants Motion to Dismiss be denied, and that the plaintiffs claim be referred back for further proceedings.... Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/10/09. (LSM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felmon Felton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?