McCafferty v. Dixon Correctional Institute et al

Plaintiff: Robert Joseph McCafferty
Defendant: Dixon Correctional Institute, Linda Eckart, Steve Rader, Ricky Williams, Jonetha Causey and James LeBlanc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00134
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Motion for Summary Judgment by Eckart is granted and this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/30/2012. (PJH)
April 8, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 4 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pltfs claims against Dixon Correctional Institute, LA Dept of Public Safety and Corrections Secy James LeBlanc, Warden Steve Rader, Sgt. Jonetha Causey and Capt. Ricky Williams is DISMISSED as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii) and this action is referred back to the MJ for further proceedings on pltfs retaliation claim against Lt. Eckart. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/8/2009. (JDL, )
March 11, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Robert Joseph McCafferty...It is recommended that the pltfs claims against Dixon Correctional Institute, LA Dept of Public Safety and Corrections Secy James LeBlanc, Warden Steve Rader, Sgt. Jonetha Causey and Capt. Ricky Williams be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii) and this action be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the pltfs retaliation claim against Lt. Eckart... Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/10/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCafferty v. Dixon Correctional Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph McCafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon Correctional Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Eckart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonetha Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?