Williams et al v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Robin Williams and Trace Williams
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Riverdale Commons Homeowner's Association, Inc. and Joni Karras
Case Number: 3:2009cv00148
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 115 Sheriff Gautreaux's Motion for Summary Judgment and all of pltfs remaining claims against Sheriff Gautreaux, individually and in his official capacity, are DISMISSED. Joni Karras' 120 Motion to designate prior rulings as final and appealable is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/19/2011. (JDL)
January 4, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 98 MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Designate Ruling as Final and Appelable. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/04/2011. (NLT) Modified on 1/7/2011 to mark as a written opinion (NLT).
December 8, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 95 Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiffs' state law tort claims for negligent infliction of emotional distress and intentional infliction of emotional distress, and denied as to plaintiff Robin Williams' claim for malicious prosecution. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/8/10. (BP)
September 29, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 51 Joni Karras' Motion for Partial Dismissal; granted as to federal 1983 claims and state law claims for conversion, fraud, and unjust enrichment, as well as state law claims for negligence insofar a s the claims arise out of the alleged misappropriation of homeowner's association dues and fees, and is denied in all other respects; granting 53 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing all claims against Riverdale Commons Homeowner's Association; and denying 81 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Original Complaint filed by Robin Williams, Trace Williams, and the Magistrate's ruling entered on 9/13/2010 is affirmed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/28/10. (PJH, ) Modified on 9/29/2010 to edit text (PJH, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Williams
Represented By: Burton P. Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trace Williams
Represented By: Burton P. Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverdale Commons Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Karras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?