Arita v. Stagg et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Niles Arita
Defendant: Perry Stagg, Jonathan Rountree, Burl Cain, Christopher Jacobs, Jimmy Smith, Patrick Woods, John Houghs, Chad Oubre, James Tillman, Matt Reed, Nick Sanders and John Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00158
Filed: March 20, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 218 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying the Defendants' 213 Motion in Limine and will defer ruling on the admissibility of Christopher Jacobs' statements and other alleged conduct until the time of trial. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/28/2013. (LLH)
August 23, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING referring to trial Plaintiff's 210 Motion in Limine to exclude certain evidence at trial. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/23/2013. (LLH)
September 14, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 162 Motion for Reconsideration /Clarification of the CourtsSupplemental Pretrial Order, rec.doc.no. 162, be and it is hereby GRANTED IN PART, such that,within ninety (90) days of the date of trial in this matter, the parties shall comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.26(a)(2)(B) with regard to any expert testimony they may seek to elicit at trial.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants Motion for Reconsideration/Clarificationof the Courts Supplemental Pretrial O rder, rec.doc.no. 162, be and it is hereby GRANTED INPART, such that the Court clarifies that the defendants will not be precluded at trial from offeringevidence which was not listed in their Pretrial Order but which is intended solely for purposes o fimpeachment.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants Motion for Reconsideration/Clarificationof the Courts Supplemental Pretrial Order, rec.doc.no. 162, be an it is hereby DENIED IN PART,such that the defendants objections to the Rulings of the Mag istrate Judge at the PretrialConference of June 19, 2012, shall not be stated with greater specificity.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants Motion for Reconsideration/Clarificationof the Courts Supplemental Pretrial Order, rec.doc.no. 162, be an it is hereby DENIED IN PART,such that the Court will not reconsider its Ruling with regard to witness Mary A. Sherry.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/13/2012. (LLH)
October 5, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 131 Report and Recommendations re: the 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. The plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Christopher Jacobs is DISMISSED for failure of the plaintiff to serve this defendant within 120 days as mandated by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Further, the Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants MarksAllen, Charles Boudreaux, John Hughes, Chad Oubre, Huey Pigeon, Matt Reed, Nick Sanders, Jimmy Smith, Perry Stagg, James Tillman and Patrick Woods (doc. no. 113) is DENIED and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/11. (DCB)
August 24, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 87 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jonathan Rountree is granted, dismissing the pla's claims asserted against this dft with prejudice. 70 Motion to D ismiss filed by Charles Boudreaux is granted, dismissing all of the pla's claims asserted against this dft except his claim for monetary damages resulting the alleged excessive force of 4/18/08. Pla's claims asserted against all dfts in their official capacities are dismissed, and this action is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/24/10. (BP, )
January 29, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 26 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Dfts' Motions to Dismiss, rec. doc. nos. 15 and 24, are granted in part, dismissing the pla's claims asserted against dft Burl Cain and dismissing all of the pla 's claims asserted against the remaining dfts except his claims for monetary damages asserting that dft Jonathan Roundtree was deliberately indifferent to the pla's serious medical needs on April 18, 2008, and that the remaining dfts subjected him to excessive force on that date. This action is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/29/10. (BP, )
October 30, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jimmy Smith, Matt Reed, Chad Oubre, Nick Sanders, Burl Cain, James Tillman, Perry Stagg, Patrick Woods, John Houghs, Jonathan Rountree, 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Allen, H uey Pidgeon. It is recommended that the dfts' Motions to Dismiss, rec.doc.nos. 15 and 24, be granted in part, dismissing the pla's claims asserted against dft Burl Cain and dismissing all of the pla's claims asserted against the remain ing dfts except his claims for monetary damages asserting that dft Jonathan Roundtree was deliberately indifferent to the pla's serious medical needs on April 18, 2008, and that the remaining dfts subjected him to excessive force on that date, and that this action be referred back for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/30/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arita v. Stagg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Niles Arita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Houghs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?