Fayard v. Tire Kingdom, Inc.

Plaintiff: Timmy Fayard
Defendant: Tire Kingdom, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00171
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 91 Motion to Consider Additional jury charges; denying 92 Motion in Limine to exclude expert testimony. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/21/2011. (JDL)
December 29, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : 69 Motion for Reconsideration of the ruling of October 12, 2010, is DENIED insofar as the motion seeks reconsideration of the Court's ruling excluding testimony by Dr. Funk that is based upon, or related to, the tests conducted on the test vehicles, and GRANTED insofar as defendant seeks to have the exclusion limited to testimony that is based upon or related to those tests. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/29/10. (BP)
October 12, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 58 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defendant's Biomechanical Engineering Expert, James R. Funk ; denying 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum; denying 67 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/12/10. (BP, )
September 13, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Motions: Pltfs motion for partial summary judgment on liability 26 is DENIED. Defts motion in limine to exclude evidence of prospective pay raises and health insurance 40 is GRANTED. Defts motion to exclude evidence on future cervical surgery 41 is DENIED, reserving defendant's right to reurge this motion when this matter is set for trial. Defts motion to exclude the testimony of Mr. Fentress and Dr. Rice 39 is DENIED, without prejudice to being readdressed at trial. Def ts motion regarding the job market and future employment discrimination 49 is DENIED without prejudice to being reurged at trial. Defts motion 38 on liability insurance is hereby GRANTED. Defts motion regarding property damage settlement 37 is hereby GRANTED. Defts motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Andrews 36 is hereby GRANTED. The motion in limine regarding James Funk 58 will be submitted upon filing of the opposition, which is due on 9/21/2010. Thereafter, this matter will be promptly assigned for pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/13/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fayard v. Tire Kingdom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Fayard
Represented By: Raynique Trenice Keelen-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Kingdom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?