Major v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Porter Major
Respondent: N. Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00279
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Porter Major will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/24/2010. (JDL, )
June 14, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 25 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 23 Motion to Set Aside Judgment Due to Fraud Upon the Court under F.R.C.P., Rule 60(B)(3) and/or Rule 60(B)6 and/or U.S.C.A. 18 1001 as well as Conspirac y under U.S.C.A. 18 241, and 242, and/or 371 23 , filed by Porter Major, is granted, and the Court's prior 12 judgment, dismissing his habeas petition as untimely-filed, is vacated. The State of Louisiana, through the Office of the D.A. for the 19th JDC, Parish of EBR shall file a response to the merits of Porter Major's habeas petition within 21 days of the date of this ruling.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/11/2010. (CMM,)
September 29, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 9 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus will be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as untimely-filed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/29/09. (BP, )
August 26, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Porter Major. It is recommended that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (R. Doc. 1) filed by petitioner, Porter Major, should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as untimely-filed. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/26/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Porter Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?