Lee v. Louisiana Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Eddie D. Lee
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Corrections, T. Etheridge, D. Haney and Unknown Jedda
Case Number: 3:2009cv00327
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Pltfs Motion to Voluntary Dismiss. This action shall be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/24/2009. (JDL, )
November 3, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 20 MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss filed by Eddie D. Lee. Within 15 days from the date of this order the pltf shall advise the Court whether he desires to withdraw his Motion to Voluntary Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/3/2009. (JDL, )
October 6, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 12 Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of the State of Louisiana, throught the Department of Public Safety and Corrections is GRANTED and the claims against it are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/2009. (JDL, )
September 3, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 15 Pltfs Objection to the 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION...IT IS ORDERED that any deft knowing a current residence, work or business address for Defts T. Etheridge and D. Haney provide it to the clerk of court, under seal, within 10 da ys so that defts may be served with process. FURTHER ORDERED that upon filing of the last known address of these defts, that these defts be served with a copy of the complaint...FURTHER ORDERED that the USM is to serve these defts wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/3/2009. (JDL, )
August 21, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Louisiana Department of Corrections...It is recommended that the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Gra nted filed on behalf of the State of Louisiana, Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections be granted and the claims against it be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/21/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Louisiana Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jedda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?