Poullard v. Woods et al

Plaintiff: John Poullard
Defendant: Laurita Woods and Unknown Mccormick
Case Number: 3:2009cv00330
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 74 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Unknown Mccormick, Laurita Woods is hereby granted and this action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/26/10. (BP, )
January 19, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Unknown Mccormick, Laurita Woods. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exh aust Administrative Remedies be granted and this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/19/10. (BP, )
January 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 49 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by John Poullard, 46 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by John Poullard, 45 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by John Poullard. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/12/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poullard v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Poullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurita Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mccormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?