Brumfield v. Oubre et al

Plaintiff: Shedrick J. Brumfield
Defendant: Chad Oubre, John Hughs and Unknown Dufour
Case Number: 3:2009cv00354
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 59 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to pay the Court's filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 06/06/2011. (NLT)
August 10, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/9/2010. (CMM, )
January 29, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court hereby approves the 14 report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and adopts it as the court's opinion herein. Accordingly the defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against the defendants in their official capacities and dismissing the plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/29/2010. (CMM,)
October 26, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Hughs, Chad Oubre. It is recommended that the defendants Motion to Dismiss be granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims asserted against the defendants in their officia l capacities and dismissing the plaintiffs claim for injunctive relief. It is further recommended that the defendants Motion to Dismiss be denied in all other respects, and that this matter be referred back for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiffs claims against the defendants in their individual capacities, of retaliatory conduct, excessive force and deliberate medical indifference. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/26/09. (LSM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Oubre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick J. Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?