Roberts v. Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Marty Roberts
Defendant: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00361
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting FGT's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and plaintiff's claims against FGT are hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2011. (PJH)
June 22, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 26 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is DENIED. The Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/21/2010. (JDL, )
April 23, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the court denied the defendant's request for an order requiring the plaintiff to produce the soil sample testing documents at his deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/23/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Roberts
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Godfrey Bruce Parkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?