French et al v. Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan

Plaintiff: Linda French and Ann French Gonsalves
Defendant: Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan
Case Number: 3:2009cv00394
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 69 MOTION to Remand filed, 81 MOTION for Reconsideration of 68 Ruling, 62 Order on Motion for Leave, Order on Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Strike, to Conduct Discovery on Administrative Record. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 11/17/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
December 14, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The 62 Ruling of the magistrate judge is affirmed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 12/13/10. (BP)
November 18, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery on Administrative Record is DENIED and the Motion For Extension of Time (R. Doc. 53) filed by plaintiffs, Linda French and Ann French Gonsalves, is hereby GRANTED and plai ntiffs are granted an additional thirty (30) days from date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike and [for] Leave to File Sur-Reply (R. Doc. 58) filed by defendant, the Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan, is GRANTED IN PART, in that the Plan is granted leave to file its sur-reply memorandum, and DENIED IN PART, in that no portion of plaintiffs reply memorandum shall be struck from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/18/2010. (NLT)
June 9, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 34 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 4 Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Transfer this Action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois filed by defendant, Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/8/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French et al v. Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda French
Represented By: J. Keith Hardie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann French Gonsalves
Represented By: J. Keith Hardie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dade Behring Life Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?