Smith v. United States Federal Government

Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Defendant: United States Federal Government, Stephen C Riedlinger, Elizabeth Haecker Ryan and Wackenhut Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00478
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT : this matter is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1915A. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/8/09. (BP, )
August 31, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : this matter is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to 28 USC 1915A. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/31/09. (BP, )
August 20, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 6 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This matter is dismissed with prejudice to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/20/09. (BP, )
August 3, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Edward Smith. It is recommended that the above-captioned matter should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/3/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States Federal Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C Riedlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Haecker Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wackenhut Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?