Kelly v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Danny Kelly
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00619
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RULING granting 67 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2016. (LLH)
September 28, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant is granted and that portion of the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment denied in the Court's ruling dated November 8, 2011 is hereby granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/25/2012. (PJH) Modified on 9/28/2012 to edit text (PJH).
November 8, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/8/2011. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Kelly
Represented By: Frank Tomeny, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?