Morris v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Mark Morris
Respondent: Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00648
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Morris, denying 32 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Mark Morris. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/30/12. (DCB)
October 20, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 19 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Morris is Dismissed Without Prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/19/2010. (CMM)
May 27, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 8 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 4 Motion to Re-Instate is GRANTED and that this matter is RE-OPENED for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/26/2010. (NLT)
March 5, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by petitioner, Mark Morris, be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/5/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?