Sandres v. LA Workforce Commission et al

Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Defendant: LA Workforce Commission and MV Tech Autoworks
Case Number: 3:2009cv00652
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: no cause specified
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 104 Motion to Receive Copy of Transcript of Hearing Plaintiff Had to Do on 9/8/2009 and her 105 Request for Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/2/2012. (JDL)
February 29, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding 86 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION; 85 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION filed by Naomi Sandres. Having found that the appealed orders of the Magistrate Judge are neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law, the orders of the Magistrate Judge are hereby AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/29/2012. (LSM)
October 27, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting 74 Pltfs Motion to Compel and deft, MV Tech Auto Work, LLC, shall provide complete responses to pltfs Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents within 15 days of the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served upon MV TechAuto Work, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/27/2011. (JDL)
October 28, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Pltfs 61 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/27/2010. (JDL)
February 17, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 37 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 25 Motion to Dismiss filed by LA Workforce Commission and 23 Motion to Dismiss filed by LA Workforce Commission are granted, dismissing pla's claims asserted against this dft, with prejudice, and this matter is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/11/10. (BP, )
December 3, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS.. It is recommended that the 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by LA Workforce Commission, 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LA Workforce Commission, be granted, dismissing the plaintiff&# 039;s claims asserted against this defendant, with prejudice, and that this matter be referred back for further proceeding. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/3/2009. (CMM,) Modified on 12/9/2009 to edit the text (NLT, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandres v. LA Workforce Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Workforce Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Tech Autoworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?