Dempsey v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Johnell Dempsey
Defendant: Burl Cain, Jeremy McKey, Tyson Bonnette, Kelly Fagan and Unknown Minyard
Case Number: 3:2009cv00666
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 41 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Johnell Dempsey is denied and the dft's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kelly Fagan, Tyson Bonnette, Jeremy McKey is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/09/2011. (NLT)
April 18, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 04/18/11. (PAH)
August 5, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims, that the plaintiff's claims asserted against the def endants in their official capacities are dismissed, the Motion to Dismiss of defendants Burl Cain and Eric Hinyard are GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against these defendants, with prejudice. Further, the cross-motions for summary judgment of the plaintiff and defendants Jeremy McKey, Tyson Bonnette and Kelly Fagen, (doc. nos. 16,25 and 27) are DENIED, and this action is referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/4/2010. (JDL, )
October 7, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 4 Letter of Deficiency...this proceeding shall be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure of the pltf to correct the deficiency of which he was notified. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/7/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dempsey v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnell Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Bonnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Minyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?