Johnson v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Donald Ray Johnson
Defendant: James LeBlanc, Nathan Burl Cain, Troy Poret and Joe Lamartiniere
Case Number: 3:2009cv00719
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 43 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judgeand the 40 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Donald Ray Johnson is hereby DENIED, and this matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Christine Noland for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/23/11. (PAH)
October 19, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 37 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Troy Poret is granted in part, dismissing the pla's claim for monetary damages asserted against the dft in the dft's of ficial capacity, dismissing the pla's claim regarding an alleged failure to provide safe access to the pla's upper bunk, dismissing the pla's claim relative to alleged verbal threats, and dismissing the pla's claim for injuries re sulting from confinement in Camp J at LSP. This matter is referred back for further proceedings in connection with the pla's claim regarding the issuance of an alleged retaliatory disciplinary report by dft Poret on 8/26/2008.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/18/10. (BP, )
June 9, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations... Accordingly, the 26 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Nathan Burl Cain, Joe Lamartiniere, James LeBlanc, and the 11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Nathan Burl Cain, Joe Lamartiniere, James LeBlanc of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, are granted dismissing the pltf's claims asserted against these dfts with prejudice, for failure of the pltf to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P., and this matter is referred back for further proceedings in connection with the pltf's claim asserted against dft Troy Poret.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/8/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?