v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Johnnie Jones, Jr. and Mary L. Jones
Defendant: Randy Lewis, Lester Lewis and Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00725
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 36 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 28 Motion to Dismiss filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company is GRANTED, dismissing this action. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 04/18/2011. (NLT)
March 1, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 16 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pla's claims against dfts Randy Lewis, Lester Lewis, Lester "Buddy" Lewis Construction Companies and Randy Lewis Construction are hereby dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/1/10. (BP, )
January 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Johnnie Jones, Jr....It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the pltfs claims against defts Randy Lewis, Lester Lewis, Lester "Buddy" Lewis Construction Companies and Randy Lewis Construction be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m)... Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/27/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Johnnie A. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?