Damond v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Calvin Damond
Defendant: Douglas McDonald and Kendall McCray
Case Number: 3:2009cv00745
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defts, Douglas McDonald and Kendall McCray, and against pltf, Glenn Calvin Damond, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2010. (JDL, )
February 25, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Glenn Calvin Damond. It is recommended that the pla's claims be dismissed as legally frivolous within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e), and that this action be dismissed, without prejudice to any state law claims which the pla may have. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/25/10. (BP, )
December 16, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to pltfs 15 motion/notice is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/16/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damond v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Calvin Damond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?