Robinson v. Academy Louisiana Company, L.L.C. dba Academy Sports + Outdoors

Plaintiff: Anna L. Robinson
Defendant: Academy Louisiana Company, L.L.C. dba Academy Sports + Outdoors
Case Number: 3:2009cv00771
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 63 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/06/2011. (NLT)
January 3, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the issue of liability. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/3/11. (BP)
November 22, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 48 MOTION to Strike, alternatively, Motion in Limine to Exclude Pla's Expert Witness, Andrew J. McPhate. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/22/10. (BP)
August 16, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Quash Discovery and for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/16/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Academy Louisiana Company, L.L.C. dba Academy Sports + Outdoors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Louisiana Company, L.L.C. dba Academy Sports + Outdoors
Represented By: Lawrence J. Duplass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?