Johnson v. Rader et al

Plaintiff: Leonard Johnson, Jr,
Defendant: Steve Rader, Charles Henyard, Thomas Blue and John Chase
Case Number: 3:2009cv00784
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Chase, Charles Henyard is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust available adminis trative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. Further, the claims against Thomas Blue are DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/26/2010. (NLT)
February 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defts 20 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing all of the pltfs claims except the claim the John Chase, Jr., Charles Henyard and Thomas Blue were deliberately indifferent to pltfs health and safety and this matter is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on pltfs Eighth Amendment claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/19/2010. (JDL, )
January 25, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Chase, Charles Henyard, Steve Rader...It is recommended that the defts motion dismiss be granted in part, dismissing all of the pltfs claims except the claim that John Chase, J r., Charles Henyard and Thomas Blue were deliberately indifferent to the pltfs health and safety and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the pltfs Eighth Amendment claim... Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/25/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Rader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Johnson, Jr,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Henyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?