Turner Industrices Group, L.L.C. v. United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company et al

Plaintiff: Turner Industries Group, L.L.C.
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc. and Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00834
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on 40 Motion to Dismiss and 113 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that Travelers Companies, Inc.'s 40 motion to dismiss Firemans's Fund's cross-claim is hereby GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Travler's Companies, Inc's 113 second motion to dismiss is HEREBY DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/29/2011. (LSM)
August 1, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 135 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines as follows: Discovery motions and completing all discovery due by 9/30/2011. Pltfs Expert Witness List due by 9/15/2011, Defts due by 9/30/2011. Pltfs Expert Reports due by 10/15/2011, Defts due by 10/30/2011. Discovery from Experts due by 12/30/2011. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/29/2011. (JDL) Modified on 8/2/2011 to mark as written opinion (JDL).
November 12, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/10/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner Industrices Group, L.L.C. v. United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turner Industries Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: John W. deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?