McDonald v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Randy McDonald
Defendant: Burl Cain, State Fire Marshall and James M. LeBlanc
Case Number: 3:2009cv00850
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiffs claim asserted against the Louisiana State Fire Marshal Inspector is dismissed for failure of the plaintiff to serve this defendant within 129 days as mandated by Rule 4( m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and the defendants motion to dismiss (doc. 40) is granted, dismissing the plaintiffs federal claims asserted against the defendants, withprejudice, and this action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2012. (PJH)
February 22, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/21/2012. (CMM)
November 30, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Randy McDonald is denied and this matter is hereby referred back to USMJ Christine Noland for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/23/2011. (NLT)
March 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 4 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This action will be dismissed, without prejudice, as a result of the plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/10. (BP, ) Modified on 3/8/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
January 26, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Randy McDonald...It is recommended that this action be dismissed, without prejudice,as a result of the plaintiffs failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/26/2010. (LSM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Fire Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?