McGrew v. Roudtree et al

Plaintiff: Carlos McGrew
Defendant: Jonathan Roudtree, Mike Thomas, Unknown McCoy, Unknown Boeker, Huey Pidgeon, Mark Allen, Joseph Russell and Greg Eirick
Case Number: 3:2009cv00859
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 254 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 225 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 228 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Defendants to Produce Tangible Objects; granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 229 Motion for In Camera Inspection and Issuance of Order to Subpoena Witnesses for Civil Trial and denying as moot 230 Motion for Production of Documents, Trial Exhibits, and Other Tangible Objects and Request for Second Pretrial Conference Hearing. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/27/2013. (CGP)
December 5, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 219 Motion to Reconsider Request for TRO/PI. The request for a temporary restraining order is denied. The request for a preliminary injunction is referred to the trial of this case. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/5/12. (DCB)
January 6, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 188 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 180 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/5/2012. (LSM)
May 9, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 149 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, rec.doc.no. 80, is granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claim of deliberate medical indifference asserted against de fendants Jonathan Roundtree, Aurielle Boeker, Mike Thomas and Anthony McCoy, and this matter is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiffs claim of excessive force asserted against defendants Huey Pidgeon, Marks Allen, Joseph Russell and Greg Eirick. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/9/2011. (PJH)
March 3, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 Pltfs Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/3/2011. (JDL)
August 24, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the ruling of the magistrate judge dated 7/8/2010 is hereby affirmed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/24/2010. (CMM, )
July 8, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's subpoenas shall not be filed into the record of this proceeding and, in the absence of a motion for leave, the Court does not authorize the non-party discovery sought by the plaintiff herein.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/8/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrew v. Roudtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Roudtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Boeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huey Pidgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Eirick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?