Cooper et al v. Wyeth, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Robert S. Cooper and Sue Ann Cooper
Defendant: Wyeth, Inc, Apothecon Inc, Schwarz Pharma, Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and ESI Lederle Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00929
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's Ruling of 03/06/2012, is hereby AMENDED for the reasons set forth above, and Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Defendants PLIVA, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc. for failure to warn under the Louisiana Products Liability Act (LPLA), based on the theories of failure to communicate and update to include an FDA-approved label on their generic drug products are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. This Ruling has no bearing on Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Defendant, Wyeth LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to ESI-Lederle, Inc. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/11/2013. (CGP)
March 6, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/6/2012. (LSM)
October 26, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Because Plaintiff's suit is governed exclusively by the LPLA and (1) Defendants did not manufacture the product which allegedly caused Plaintiffs injuries as is required by the LPLA; and (2) Plaintiff asserts claims not supported by LPLA which provides exclusive theories of recovery, the Court GRANTS 33 Defendant Schwarzs Motion for Summary Judgment and 39 Defendant Wyeths Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to all of Plaintiffs claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/26/2010. (NLT)
September 29, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment by Apothecon, Inc. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/28/10. (BP, )
June 25, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 19 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/25/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Wyeth, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Cooper
Represented By: Steven Courtney Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Ann Cooper
Represented By: Steven Courtney Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apothecon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Lederle Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?