Brady v. Gautreaux et al

Plaintiff: Louis Brady, Jr
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III and Dennis Grimes
Case Number: 3:2009cv00947
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Approving the Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge and adopts it as the court's opinion herein. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied, and the dft's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted, dismissing the pltf's claims asserted against the dft, with prejudice, and this action is Dismissed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/15/2011. (CMM)
May 26, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Designate Ruling as Final and Appealable. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/25/2011. (LSM)
May 9, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 43 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs claims asserted against the deft identified as "C. Ron" or "C. Rond" are dismissed for failure of pltf to serve this deft within 120 days as mandated by FRCP 4(m). Further, the 38 Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles Bridges is denied. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the pltfs state law claims and this action be referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/9/2011. (JDL)
February 18, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 37 the U.S. Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied and the 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis Grimes, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, is granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against these defendant, with prejudice. Further, this matter is referred back to the U.S. Magistrate for further proceedings.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/17/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Gautreaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Brady, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?