Ellis v. Ethicon Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cathrina Ellis
Defendant: Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, St. Elizabeth Hospital and Our Lady of the Lake Ascension Community Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00949
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER : Plaintiffs' Rule 56(f) Motion (doc. 46) is granted insofar as it requests that defendants' motion for summary judgment be denied. Defendants' motion (doc. 44) for summary judgment or, alternatively, for entry of Lone Pine case management order, is denied without prejudice. Defendants are free to file another motion for summary judgment after conclusion of discovery. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/6/10. (BP)
July 26, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 31 Motion to Dismiss is granted and the claim against St. Elizabeth will be dismissed based upon the Court's prior ruling holding that St. Elizabeth was fraudulently joined. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/23/2010. (JDL, )
March 24, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Remand 6 filed by pltfs, Cathrina Ellis, individually and on behalf of her minor children, McKenzy Ellis and Taelor Ellis is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2010. (JDL, )
February 19, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Cathrina Ellis, individually and on behalf of her minor children, McKenzy Ellis and Taelor Ellis...It is recommended that the Motion to Remand be denied... Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/19/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Ethicon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathrina Ellis
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Stephanie Lottinger Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephanie Lottinger Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Elizabeth Hospital
Represented By: Douglas K. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our Lady of the Lake Ascension Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas K. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?