Shelton v. Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Cedric Shelton
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Kassie Freeman, Tony Clayton, Patrick Magee, Ernie Hughes and Southern University System Foundation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00968
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 95 Tony Clayton's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/18/2012. (JDL)
January 23, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER... Defendants 61 motion in limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Sheltons 62 motion in limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants 90 motion to strike is GRANTED. Defendants 91 motion to supplement witness list is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/23/2012. (LSM)
January 10, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING... the Southern University System Foundations 70 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Sheltons defamation claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Because no claims remain against the Foundation, it is excused from trial in this matter, currently scheduled for January 23, 2012. The [63,64] motions in limine filed by the Foundation and the 86 motion to stay are hereby DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/10/2012. (LSM) Modified on 1/10/2012 to edit text (LSM).
September 12, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/9/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cedric Shelton
Represented By: Colette Greggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Southern University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassie Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern University System Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?